WY HB0069 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to revenue for transportation purposes; increasing the fuel tax; amending certain distributions of fuel tax revenues accordingly; restricting the expenditure of additional revenue raised; requiring a report; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Highway funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Amendment Failed (Y: 8 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Amendment Failed (Y: 8 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-31 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - House - H03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - House - H03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Amendment Failed (Y: 8 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Amendment Failed (Y: 8 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-31 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - House - H03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - House - H03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2013-02-15 | Governor Signed HEA38 | |
2013-02-14 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0038 |
2013-02-14 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0038 |
2013-02-14 | Assigned Number HEA0038 | |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-13 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-02-13 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-02-12 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-18 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-18 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-01-17 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-17 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-01-16 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-16 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-01-16 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-16 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-01-16 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-16 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-16 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-14 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 |
2013-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2012-12-27 | Bill Number Assigned |