WY HB0066 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-23 - COW:Failed 7-52-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-23 - COW:Failed 7-52-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicle license plates; authorizing distinctive Yellowstone National Park license plates; specifying requirements; authorizing a fee; creating an account; providing for termination of the issuance of the distinctive plates as specified; requiring a report upon termination; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Yellowstone license plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-23 - House - COW:Failed 7-52-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-01-19 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-23 | House | COW:Failed 7-52-1-0-0 |
2017-01-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-19 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 |
2017-01-16 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2017-01-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-16 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2017-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-12-28 | Bill Number Assigned |