WY HB0066 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 15 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - President Signed HEA No. 0114
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 15 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - President Signed HEA No. 0114
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health and safety; creating the municipal solid waste facility cease and transfer program; creating criteria for the program; creating municipal solid waste facility cease and transfer accounts; providing qualifications for applicants to receive funds under the program; providing authority for the state loan and investment board to award funds under the program; providing for the department of environmental quality to administer the program; providing that the department shall develop a general permit as specified; providing assistance for closure of small landfills; requiring financial responsibility of municipal solid waste facility operators as specified; requiring financial reporting to the department of environmental quality; providing ineligibility for state funding for failure to perform financial responsibility actions as specified; providing rulemaking authority; providing for reports; providing appropriations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Municipal solid waste facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - Senate - S Adopted HB0066JC01 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - H Adopted HB0066JC01 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - H Did Not Concur (Y: 0 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-15 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - H Adopted HB0066JC01 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - H Did Not Concur (Y: 0 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-15 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0114 |
2013-02-27 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0114 |
2013-02-27 | Assigned Number HEA0114 | |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Adopted HB0066JC01 |
2013-02-26 | House | Adopted HB0066JC01 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2013-02-19 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2013-02-19 | House | Did Not Concur |
2013-02-15 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-14 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-14 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-14 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-02-13 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-13 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Rereferred to S02 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-25 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-25 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-25 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-23 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-23 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-16 | House | Rereferred to H02 |
2013-01-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-16 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 |
2013-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2012-12-26 | Bill Number Assigned |