WY HB0064 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 87
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 87
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the insurance code; amending the scope of service contracts; specifying that theft protection program warranties are not insurance; specifying that theft protection programs and theft protection program warranties are not service contracts; amending and creating definitions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Vehicle service contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - Concur:Passed 53-6-1-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Assigned Chapter Number 87 | |
2022-03-15 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0055 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0055 |
2022-03-11 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0055 |
2022-03-10 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0055 | |
2022-03-10 | House | Concur:Passed 53-6-1-0-0 |
2022-03-10 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2022-03-10 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-03-08 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2022-03-08 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-03-01 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0 |
2022-02-28 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-02-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2022-02-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2022-02-24 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-22 | House | :Rerefer to H08 - Transportation |
2022-02-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 59-1-0-0-0 |
2022-02-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-04 | Bill Number Assigned |