WY HB0060 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 44 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to institutions of the state; amending qualifications to receive services from state health care facilities; providing for the continued care of persons at the Wyoming life resource center as specified; amending the mission of state health care facilities; conforming statutes; specifying applicable federal standards for rulemaking; updating obsolete language; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State health facility missions-statutory compliance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-29 - House - Concur:Passed 53-5-2-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - Concur:Passed 54-5-1-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-4-0-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-4-0-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-4-0-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07 Chapter No. 44 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-07 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-04 Governor Signed HEA No. 0019
2016-03-01SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0019
2016-02-29HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0019
2016-02-29 Assigned Number HEA No. 0019
2016-02-29HouseConcur:Passed 53-5-2-0-0
2016-02-26HouseReceived for Concurrence
2016-02-26Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2016-02-25Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-24SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-24SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-24 S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-22SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
2016-02-22SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-19House3rd Reading:Passed 56-4-0-0-0
2016-02-18House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-17House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2016-02-16HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-11HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-11 H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2016-02-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor 58-1-1-0-0
2016-02-05HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-01-29 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback