WY HB0058 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number 60
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the administration of government; repealing the sunset date of the Wyoming investment in nursing program; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sunset date-Wyoming investment in nursing program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-6-0-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19 Assigned Chapter Number 60
2019-02-19 Governor Signed HEA No. 0030
2019-02-15SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0030
2019-02-15HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0030
2019-02-14 Assigned Number HEA No. 0030
2019-02-14Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2019-02-13Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-12SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-06SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-06SenateS10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
2019-01-22SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-17House3rd Reading:Passed 54-6-0-0-0
2019-01-16House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-15HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-14HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-14HouseH10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-12-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback