WY HB0058 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - President Signed HEA No. 0011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - President Signed HEA No. 0011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; authorizing the game and fish commission to modify restrictions imposed on applications for specified game animal licenses; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Game animal licenses-limitations.
Sponsors
Rep. William Haley [R] | Rep. Jim Allen [R] | Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Rep. Tyler Lindholm [R] |
Rep. Jerry Paxton [R] | Rep. Albert Sommers [R] | Sen. Glenn Moniz [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0011 |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0011 |
2018-03-05 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0011 | |
2018-03-05 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-03-01 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-20 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-20 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2018-02-20 | House | H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 55-4-1-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-01-12 | Bill Number Assigned |