WY HB0057 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 93 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 93 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public welfare; establishing a private hospital assessment as specified; providing for the use of assessments to obtain federal matching funds; providing for payments to private hospitals as specified; establishing an account; providing definitions; providing regulatory authority; providing penalties; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Upper payment limit program-private hospitals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor 51-7-2-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor 51-7-2-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Chapter No. 93 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2016-03-04 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0024 | |
2016-03-01 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0024 |
2016-03-01 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0024 |
2016-03-01 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0024 | |
2016-03-01 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-26 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-26 | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-26 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-26 | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-23 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0 |
2016-02-22 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-19 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2016-02-18 | House | COW:Passed |
2016-02-15 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-15 | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-15 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2016-02-15 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-15 | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor 51-7-2-0-0 |
2016-02-05 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-01-29 | Bill Number Assigned |