WY HB0051 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Assigned Chapter Number 30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Assigned Chapter Number 30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to professional services procurement; renumbering and amending provisions related to the procurement of professional architectural, engineering and land surveying services; modifying applicability of resident firm selection requirements; specifying duties of the state construction department; making conforming amendments; requiring rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Professional services procurement-amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - Concur:Passed 54-6-0-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-4-1-0-1 (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-10-0-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-4-1-0-1 (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-10-0-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Assigned Chapter Number 30 | |
2020-03-10 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0029 | |
2020-03-06 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0029 |
2020-03-06 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0029 |
2020-03-05 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0029 | |
2020-03-05 | House | Concur:Passed 54-6-0-0-0 |
2020-03-04 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 24-4-1-0-1 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2020-02-28 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-26 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-14 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 50-10-0-0-0 |
2020-02-13 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-12 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-02-11 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-11 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 58-1-1-0-0 |
2020-02-07 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-01-16 | Bill Number Assigned |