WY HB0049 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 109 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to abandoned vehicles; providing for a junk vehicle certificate of title to dispose of abandoned vehicles as specified; creating definitions; amending provisions for the disposition of an abandoned vehicle as specified; increasing the low value vehicle threshold related to abandoned vehicles; increasing allowable towing and storage expenses; amending a statutory reference to vehicle registration; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abandoned vehicles-2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-04 - Senate - Adopted HB0049JC001: 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - Adopted HB0049JC001: 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Adopted HB0049JC001: 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - Adopted HB0049JC001: 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Concur:Failed 0-59-1-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-01 - House - Concur:Failed 0-59-1-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 57-1-2-0- (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16 Chapter No. 109 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-11 Governor Signed HEA No. 0051
2016-03-04SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0051
2016-03-04HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0051
2016-03-04 Assigned Number HEA No. 0051
2016-03-04SenateAdopted HB0049JC001: 26-3-1-0-0
2016-03-04HouseAdopted HB0049JC001: 60-0-0-0-0
2016-03-03SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2016-03-01HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2016-03-01HouseConcur:Failed 0-59-1-0-0
2016-02-29HouseReceived for Concurrence
2016-02-29Senate3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0
2016-02-26Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-25SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-25SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-25 S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
2016-02-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-23House3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0
2016-02-22House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-19House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2016-02-18HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-12HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-11 H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2016-02-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 57-1-2-0-
2016-02-05HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-01-26 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback