WY HB0048 | 2012 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to speed limits; establishing a maximum speed limit declarable by state authorities; modifying and clarifying the state superintendent's ability to designate higher speed limits; amending the identification of speeding violations that are kept in state records; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eighty miles per hour speed limit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - H08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - H08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H08 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H08 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-07 (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
2012-02-29 (S) Introduced and Referred to S08; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff
2012-02-29 (S) Received for Introduction
2012-02-28 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2012-02-27 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-02-24 (H) Passed CoW
2012-02-24 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-24 (H) Amendments Adopted
2012-02-22 (H) Placed on General File
2012-02-22 (H08) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2012-02-15 (H) Introduced and Referred to H08
2012-02-13 (H) Received for Introduction
2012-02-07 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback