WY HB0042 | 2020 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Assigned Chapter Number 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to criminal procedure and sentencing; amending requirements for establishing rules for good time allowances to inmates and parolees; requiring rulemaking; specifying applicability; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Good time allowances for jail time.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - House - Concur:Passed 56-4-0-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10 Assigned Chapter Number 28
2020-03-10 Governor Signed HEA No. 0028
2020-03-06SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0028
2020-03-06HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0028
2020-03-05 Assigned Number HEA No. 0028
2020-03-05HouseConcur:Passed 56-4-0-0-0
2020-03-04HouseReceived for Concurrence
2020-03-04Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2020-03-03Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-03-02SenateCOW:Passed
2020-02-28SenatePlaced on General File
2020-02-28SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2020-02-26SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2020-02-19SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-19House3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
2020-02-18House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-17HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-14HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-14HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2020-02-10HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 59-0-1-0-0
2020-02-07HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-01-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback