WY HB0042 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-05 - Chapter No. 127 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to unclaimed property; amending language to include merchant stored value cards; providing definitions; extending the period for abandonment of gift certificates, merchant stored value cards and credit memos; providing an exemption; repealing related provisions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unclaimed property-merchant stored value cards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-27 - House - Adopted HB0042JC001: 41-15-4-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Adopted HB0042JC001: 41-15-4-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Adopted HB0042JC001: 41-15-4-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - Concur:Failed 21-38-1-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - House - Concur:Failed 21-38-1-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-05 Chapter No. 127 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-03-05 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-03-04 Governor Signed HEA No. 0087
2015-03-03SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0087
2015-03-02HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0087
2015-02-27 Assigned Number HEA No. 0087
2015-02-27HouseAdopted HB0042JC001: 41-15-4-0-0
2015-02-23SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-23HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-23HouseConcur:Failed 21-38-1-0-0
2015-02-20HouseReceived for Concurrence
2015-02-20Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
2015-02-19Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-18SenateCOW:Passed
2015-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2015-02-12 Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-02-04SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2015-01-26SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-01-22House3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0
2015-01-21House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-01-20HouseCOW:Passed
2015-01-19HousePlaced on General File
2015-01-19 Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2015-01-13HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2015-01-13HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-02 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback