WY HB0041 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 55 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to water development projects; authorizing construction of designated water projects; describing projects; specifying terms and conditions of funding for projects; providing appropriations; modifying project descriptions and terms of appropriations for specified prior projects; repealing an obsolete provision; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus water bill-construction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 55-3-2-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07 Chapter No. 55 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-07 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-04 Governor Signed HEA No. 0032
2016-03-01SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0032
2016-03-01HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0032
2016-03-01 Assigned Number HEA No. 0032
2016-03-01Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-29Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-26SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-26SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-26 S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-23SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
2016-02-23SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-23House3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0
2016-02-22House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-19House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2016-02-18HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-11HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-11 H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2016-02-10HouseCOW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2016-02-09HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-09 H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2016-02-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 55-3-2-0-0
2016-02-05HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-01-22 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback