WY HB0040 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 95 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 95 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education accountability; modifying the Wyoming Accountability in Education Act as specified; modifying provisions to comply with the federal Every Student Succeeds Act; conforming provisions; modifying the operation of the advisory committee to the select committee on statewide education accountability; repealing the select committee on statewide education accountability; requiring reporting; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Education accountability.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - House - Concur:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - Concur:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - Concur:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Chapter No. 95 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-06 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-06 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0061 | |
2017-02-27 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0061 |
2017-02-27 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0061 |
2017-02-24 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0061 | |
2017-02-24 | House | Concur:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 |
2017-02-23 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2017-02-23 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-21 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-15 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-13 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 |
2017-01-26 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-20 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-17 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2017-01-17 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-17 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2017-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-12-15 | Bill Number Assigned |