WY HB0038 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation of coal; providing industry factors for valuation of coal sold away from the mouth of the mine; requiring a report; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Coal valuation-industry factors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - Senate - Amendment Failed (Y: 6 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - Senate - S03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - H03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - H03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H03 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H03 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - S03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - H03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - H03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H03 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H03 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c) | |
2012-03-05 | (S) Recomit to S03 in accord with SR 13-2 absent objection | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-03-02 | Amendment Failed | |
2012-03-02 | Amendment Failed | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Laid Back Pursuant to SR 10-4 (a) | |
2012-02-29 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-29 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-29 | (S) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-02-28 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-28 | (S03) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-21 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S03 | |
2012-02-21 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-20 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-02-17 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-02-16 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-16 | Amendment Failed | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-15 | (H03) Recommended Do Pass | |
2012-02-13 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H03 | |
2012-02-13 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2012-01-31 | Bill Number Assigned |