WY HB0035 | 2014 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Motion to Do Pass Failed Returned in Accordance with SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the legislature; establishing the select committee on the transfer of public land as specified; providing a definition; providing a sunset date; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Select committee on the transfer of public land.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-05 - Senate - S09 Motion to Do Pass Failed Returned in Accordance with SR 5-4 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - H09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H09 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-05SenateMotion to Do Pass Failed Returned in Accordance with SR 5-4
2014-02-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09
2014-02-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2014-02-20HousePassed 3rd Reading
2014-02-20HouseReported Back from H02 Pursuant to H Rule 4-8 & Restored to Third Reading
2014-02-20HouseRecommended Do Pass
2014-02-20HouseRereferred to H02
2014-02-19HousePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-18HousePassed CoW
2014-02-18 Amendment Adopted
2014-02-18HouseAmendments Adopted
2014-02-14HousePlaced on General File
2014-02-14HouseRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2014-02-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09
2014-02-10HouseReceived for Introduction
2014-01-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback