WY HB0035 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to notarial acts; providing a short form for certifying instruments executed on behalf of a business entity; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Notarial certification of business entity instrument.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - House - H Did Concur (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - S07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H07 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - S07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H07 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2012-03-15 | Governor Signed HEA0034 | |
2012-03-07 | (S) President Signed HEA No. 0034 | |
2012-03-07 | (H) Speaker Signed HEA No. 0034 | |
2012-03-06 | Assigned Number HEA0034 | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Did Concur | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received for Concurrence | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-03-05 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-03-05 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | (S) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-03-01 | (S07) Recommended Do Pass | |
2012-02-28 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S07 | |
2012-02-28 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-28 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-02-27 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-02-24 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-20 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-20 | (H07) Recommended Do Pass | |
2012-02-14 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H07 | |
2012-02-13 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2012-01-30 | Bill Number Assigned |