WY HB0033 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; authorizing drivers to exceed posted speed limits in order to pass vehicles traveling under the posted speed limit; specifying additional restrictions and application; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exceeding speed limit while passing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-01 - Senate - Motion to Do Pass Failed (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-01-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-01 (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
2011-02-01 Motion to Do Pass Failed
2011-01-27 (S) Introduced and Referred to S08; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff
2011-01-26 (S) Received for Introduction
2011-01-24 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-01-21 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-01-20 (H) Passed CoW
2011-01-19 (H) Placed on General File
2011-01-19 (H08) Recommended Do Pass
2011-01-13 (H) Introduced and Referred to H08
2011-01-11 (H) Received for Introduction
2010-12-20 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback