WY HB0031 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to county coroners; amending the duties of the board of coroner standards to authorize investigations of coroner misconduct during coroner's cases; amending procedures for complaints against coroners and deputy coroners; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Board of coroner standards-investigation authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-27 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 0-9-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2021-03-24 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2021-01-27 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 0-9-0-0-0 |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-12-29 | Bill Number Assigned |