WY HB0031 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the pari-mutuel commission; providing for licensing of out-of-state simulcasting facilities; providing for source market fees; providing for distribution of fees; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Pari-mutuel regulation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-15 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2011-02-15 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0003 | |
2011-02-11 | (S) President Signed HEA No. 0003 | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Speaker Signed HEA No. 0003 | |
2011-02-10 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0003 | |
2011-02-10 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-09 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-03 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-03 | (S06) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S06 | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Reconsidered | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Failed 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-19 | (H) Rereferred to General File | |
2011-01-17 | (H) Rereferred to H02 | |
2011-01-17 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-17 | (H06) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-11 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H06 | |
2011-01-11 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-12-17 | Bill Number Assigned |