WY HB0029 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-21 - COW:Failed 22-38-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to marihuana possession; amending penalties for marihuana possession as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marihuana possession.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-01-21 - House - COW:Failed 22-38-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-20 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-01-21HouseCOW:Failed 22-38-0-0-0
2015-01-20HousePlaced on General File
2015-01-20 Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2015-01-14HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2015-01-13HouseReceived for Introduction
2014-12-31 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback