WY HB0027 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Chapter No. 60 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Chapter No. 60 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to environmental quality; authorizing the governor to begin negotiations with the nuclear regulatory commission to seek an agreement for the state to assume regulation of source materials from uranium mining and milling and the wastes associated with the recovery, mining and milling of such source materials, as specified; authorizing the governor to negotiate and enter a final agreement with the nuclear regulatory commission, as specified; providing for the department of environmental quality to administer the program; providing rulemaking authority; authorizing additional positions as specified; directing the department of environmental quality to adopt a fee structure under the program as specified; providing appropriations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
NRC agreement state authorization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - House - Concur:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - House - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - House - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - House - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - House - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | Chapter No. 60 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-02-27 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-02-27 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0043 | |
2015-02-23 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0043 |
2015-02-23 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0043 |
2015-02-23 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0043 | |
2015-02-23 | House | Concur:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2015-02-20 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2015-02-20 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-18 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-18 | Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-11 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-11 | Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 | |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-30 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 |
2015-01-29 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-28 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-26 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-26 | Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-16 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2015-01-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-16 | Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2015-01-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-12-31 | Bill Number Assigned |