WY HB0023 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to sex offender registration and notification; amending the information sex offenders are required to provide; requiring specified juveniles to register as sex offenders; amending the information that shall be provided to the public; amending the registration requirements for specified offenses; conforming provisions; requiring offenders convicted but not yet sentenced to register as sex offenders; requiring notice by an offender who will travel out of the country as specified; eliminating language that may permit an offender who has not registered as required to avoid sanctions after a specified time; clarifying conditions under which an offender may petition a court to be relieved of registration requirements; amending and creating definitions; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sex offender registration amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-01 - House - H Did Concur (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - S01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-03 Assigned Chapter Number
2011-03-03 Governor Signed HEA No. 0092
2011-03-03 (S) President Signed HEA No. 0092
2011-03-02 (H) Speaker Signed HEA No. 0092
2011-03-01 Assigned Number HEA No. 0092
2011-03-01 (H) Did Concur
2011-03-01 (H) Received for Concurrence
2011-02-28 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-02-25 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-02-24 (S) Passed CoW
2011-02-23 (S) Placed on General File
2011-02-23 (S02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-02-14 (S) Rereferred to S02
2011-02-14 (S) Placed on General File
2011-02-14 (S01) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-01-31 (S) Introduced and Referred to S01
2011-01-31 (S) Received for Introduction
2011-01-28 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-01-27 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-01-26 (H) Passed CoW
2011-01-25 (H) Placed on General File
2011-01-25 (H02) Recommended Do Pass
2011-01-17 (H) Rereferred to H02
2011-01-17 (H) Placed on General File
2011-01-17 (H01) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-01-11 (H) Introduced and Referred to H01
2011-01-11 (H) Received for Introduction
2010-12-06 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback