WY HB0021 | 2024 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Assigned Chapter Number 11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Assigned Chapter Number 11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to K-12 school facilities; repealing the requirement that charter schools operate successfully for three (3) years to receive reimbursement for leasing expenses; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Charter school leasing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-1-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 61-0-1-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 61-0-1-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Assigned Chapter Number 11 | |
2024-03-04 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0009 | |
2024-02-29 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0009 |
2024-02-28 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0009 |
2024-02-28 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0009 | |
2024-02-28 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-1-0-0-0 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-26 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2024-02-23 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-19 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 |
2024-02-16 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-15 | House | COW:Passed |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2024-02-14 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 61-0-1-0-0 |
2024-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-12-14 | Bill Number Assigned |