WY HB0021 | 2014 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to taxation and revenue; providing for the property tax exemption for charitable organizations as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property tax exemption-charity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-05 - House - H Did Concur (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - S03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - H03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H03 (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-11 Assigned Chapter Number
2014-03-10 Governor Signed HEA0054
2014-03-06SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0054
2014-03-06HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0054
2014-03-05 Assigned Number HEA0054
2014-03-05HouseDid Concur
2014-03-05HouseReceived for Concurrence
2014-03-05SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2014-03-04SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2014-03-03SenatePassed CoW
2014-03-03 Amendment Adopted
2014-03-03SenateAmendments Adopted
2014-02-27SenatePlaced on General File
2014-02-27SenateRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2014-02-25SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03
2014-02-25SenateReceived for Introduction
2014-02-24HousePassed 3rd Reading
2014-02-21HousePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-20HousePassed CoW
2014-02-20 Amendment Adopted
2014-02-20HouseAmendments Adopted
2014-02-14HousePlaced on General File
2014-02-14HouseRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2014-02-10HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03
2014-02-10HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-12-31 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback