WY HB0021 | 2012 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-12 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; authorizing drivers to exceed posted speed limits in order to pass vehicles traveling under the posted speed limit; specifying additional restrictions and application; requiring a report; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exceeding speed limit while passing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-06 - House - H Did Concur (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - S08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H08 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-12 Assigned Chapter Number
2012-03-09 Governor SignedHEA0031
2012-03-07 (S) President Signed HEA No. 0031
2012-03-07 (H) Speaker Signed HEA No. 0031
2012-03-06 Assigned Number HEA0031
2012-03-06 (H) Did Concur
2012-03-06 (H) Received for Concurrence
2012-03-06 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2012-03-05 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-03-02 (S) Passed CoW
2012-03-02 Amendment Adopted
2012-03-02 (S) Amendments Adopted
2012-03-01 (S) Placed on General File
2012-03-01 (S08) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2012-02-23 (S) Introduced and Referred to S08
2012-02-22 (S) Received for Introduction
2012-02-22 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2012-02-21 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-02-20 (H) Passed CoW
2012-02-17 (H) Placed on General File
2012-02-17 (H08) Recommended Do Pass
2012-02-14 (H) Introduced and Referred to H08
2012-02-13 (H) Received for Introduction
2012-01-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback