WY HB0020 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Assigned Chapter Number 38
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Assigned Chapter Number 38
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; amending the driver's license requirement to demonstrate visual acuity; requiring rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Driver's license requirements-visual acuity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Assigned Chapter Number 38 | |
2021-03-30 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0020 | |
2021-03-26 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0020 |
2021-03-26 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0020 |
2021-03-26 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0020 | |
2021-03-25 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-18 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-03 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-02 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-01 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-02-02 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2021-01-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-12-21 | Bill Number Assigned |