WY HB0019 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 113 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to statewide student assessment; modifying the statewide student assessment requirements; requiring administration of the statewide student assessment in specified grades and subjects; requiring the statewide student assessment system to include interim assessments as specified; eliminating the requirement for school districts to administer common benchmark adaptive assessments; clarifying administration of the college entrance examination; replacing the job skills assessment with a career readiness examination as specified; eliminating administration of the college placement assessment; conforming phase I school accountability requirements; conforming phase II effective date; requiring reports; requiring studies; continuing the operation of the select committee on statewide education accountability; continuing the operation of the advisory committee; appropriating funds; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statewide student assessment.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2016-03-04 - Senate - Adopted HB0019JC001: 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - Adopted HB0019JC001: 44-12-4-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Adopted HB0019JC001: 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - Adopted HB0019JC001: 44-12-4-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - Concur:Failed 0-58-2-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - Concur:Failed 0-58-2-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - Concur:Failed 0-58-2-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-9-0-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-9-0-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-9-0-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 45-13-2-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 45-13-2-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 45-13-2-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16 Chapter No. 113 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-11 Governor Signed HEA No. 0055
2016-03-04SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0055
2016-03-04HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0055
2016-03-04 Assigned Number HEA No. 0055
2016-03-04SenateAdopted HB0019JC001: 26-3-1-0-0
2016-03-04HouseAdopted HB0019JC001: 44-12-4-0-0
2016-03-03SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2016-03-03HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2016-03-02HouseConcur:Failed 0-58-2-0-0
2016-03-02HouseReceived for Concurrence
2016-03-02Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0
2016-03-01Senate3rd Reading:Laid Back
2016-02-29Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-26SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-26SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-26 S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-25SenateCOW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2016-02-25SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-25 S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2016-02-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-23House3rd Reading:Passed 51-9-0-0-0
2016-02-22House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-19House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2016-02-18HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-15HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-15 H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2016-02-11HouseCOW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2016-02-11HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-11 H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2016-02-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education 45-13-2-0-0
2016-02-05HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-01-15 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback