WY HB0018 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to honoring military members; authorizing the creation of memorials to military members who died in training accidents in Wyoming; authorizing expenditure of nonstate funds; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Military training memorials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 46-14-0-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - Amendment adopted 31-29-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - COW:Passed 37-21-2-0-0 (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 46-14-0-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - Amendment adopted 31-29-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - COW:Passed 37-21-2-0-0 (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | Assigned Chapter Number 15 | |
2021-02-09 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0007 | |
2021-02-05 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0007 |
2021-02-05 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0007 |
2021-02-04 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0007 | |
2021-02-04 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-02-02 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-0-1-0 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-01 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 46-14-0-0-0 |
2021-01-29 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-01-28 | House | COW:Passed 37-21-2-0-0 |
2021-01-28 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-01-28 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0 |
2021-01-27 | House | H08 - Transportation:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2021-01-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-01-19 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2021-01-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-12-21 | Bill Number Assigned |