WY HB0018 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish and the department of state parks and cultural resources; providing for control of aquatic invasive species; providing for inspection of conveyances; providing for decontamination orders; providing for impoundment and quarantine; providing for rules; providing for inspection fees; providing civil and criminal penalties; authorizing the filling of a vacant position; providing an appropriation; providing a continuous appropriation; requiring reports; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Aquatic invasive species-2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - Senate - S Adopted HB0018JC01 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - H06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - H06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2010-03-10 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0062 | |
2010-03-05 | (S) President Signed HEA No. 0062 | |
2010-03-05 | (H) Speaker Signed HEA No. 0062 | |
2010-03-05 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0062 | |
2010-03-04 | (S) Adopted HB0018JC01 | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Adopted HB0018JC01 | |
2010-03-04 | (S) Appointed JCC01 Members | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Appointed JCC01 Members | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Did Not Concur | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Received for Concurrence | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-01 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-26 | (S02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2010-02-24 | (S) Rereferred to S02 | |
2010-02-24 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-24 | (S06) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2010-02-22 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S06 | |
2010-02-22 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-18 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-18 | Amendment Failed | |
2010-02-17 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-16 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-16 | (H02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Rereferred to H02 | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-11 | (H06) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2010-02-09 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H06 | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2009-12-28 | Bill Number Assigned |