WY HB0016 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Assigned Chapter Number 90
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; amending the elements of theft to incorporate various methods of stealing into one crime; modifying penalties for stealing related offenses; providing a statement of intent; making conforming amendments; repealing provisions incorporated into the offense of theft; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consolidation of theft crimes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - Adopted HB0016JC001: 45-13-2-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Concur:Failed 23-37-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Amendment failed 2-28-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-28 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13 Assigned Chapter Number 90
2020-03-13 Governor Signed HEA No. 0058
2020-03-10SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0058
2020-03-10HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0058
2020-03-10 Assigned Number HEA No. 0058
2020-03-05SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2020-03-05HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2020-03-05HouseConcur:Failed 23-37-0-0-0
2020-03-04HouseReceived for Concurrence
2020-03-04Senate3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0
2020-03-03Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-03-02SenateCOW:Passed
2020-02-28SenatePlaced on General File
2020-02-28SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2020-02-26SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2020-02-18SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-17House3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0-0
2020-02-14House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-13HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-12HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-12HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2020-02-10HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 59-0-1-0-0
2020-02-07HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-12-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback