WY HB0013 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-02 - Placed on General File
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-02 - Placed on General File
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to municipalities; repealing and removing certain extraterritorial jurisdiction asserted by municipalities; modifying notice requirements to landowners outside municipal boundaries; providing for municipal comments prior to approval of plats as specified; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Municipal extraterritorial jurisdiction- repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 56-2-2-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 56-2-2-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 56-2-2-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 56-2-2-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-03-02 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-20 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 56-2-2-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-12-13 | Bill Number Assigned |