WY HB0013 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Chapter No. 14 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Chapter No. 14 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state parks and cultural resources; authorizing use of certain fee income for general operations and maintenance of department facilities as specified; creating an account; providing for interest to accrue to the account; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State parks-use of fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-17 - House - Concur:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - Concur:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - Concur:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | Chapter No. 14 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-02-25 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0011 | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0011 |
2015-02-20 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0011 |
2015-02-17 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0011 | |
2015-02-17 | House | Concur:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2015-02-12 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2015-02-12 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-10 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-10 | Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-09 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-05 | Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 | |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-19 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 |
2015-01-16 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-15 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-14 | Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2015-01-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-12-12 | Bill Number Assigned |