WY HB0010 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the tribes of the Wind River Indian Reservation; specifying the definition and rule of construction for the cooperative tribal governing body; clarifying statutory references to either or both tribes; correcting references from the obsolete joint business council to the cooperative tribal governing body; standardizing references to either tribe or the cooperative tribal governing body; modifying foreign language references in title 21 to include world languages; correcting references to the Wind River Indian Reservation; repealing the obsolete Wyoming Indian Affairs Council; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Tribal reference amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - Concur:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Assigned Chapter Number 82 | |
2022-03-15 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0046 | |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0046 |
2022-03-10 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0046 |
2022-03-10 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0046 | |
2022-03-10 | House | Concur:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2022-03-10 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2022-03-09 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-03-07 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2022-03-04 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | :Refer to S04 - Education |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-28 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2022-02-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-02-24 | House | COW:Passed |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on General File |
2022-02-22 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-15 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 60-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-12-17 | Bill Number Assigned |