WY HB0009 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Chapter No. 36 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Chapter No. 36 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public education; prohibiting the conveyance or transfer of ownership rights of writings and other communications created by a student at the University of Wyoming or any community college in the state as specified; providing for an expectation of privacy in student writings and other communications as specified; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Student ownership and privacy rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-13-1-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-13-1-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-13-1-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Chapter No. 36 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-02-21 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0027 | |
2017-02-15 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0027 |
2017-02-15 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0027 |
2017-02-14 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0027 | |
2017-02-13 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 16-13-1-0-0 |
2017-02-10 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-06 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-18 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 |
2017-01-17 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-16 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-16 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2017-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-12-07 | Bill Number Assigned |