WY HB0003 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to mental health professions licensing and certification; amending qualifications to practice as a certified addictions practitioner; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Certified addictions practitioners-certification amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-3-2-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | Assigned Chapter Number 4 | |
2021-02-08 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0001 | |
2021-02-04 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0001 |
2021-02-03 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0001 |
2021-02-03 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0001 | |
2021-02-03 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 25-3-2-0-0 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-02-01 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-02-01 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-01-29 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 52-7-1-0-0 |
2021-01-28 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-01-27 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-01-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-01-27 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2021-01-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-12-11 | Bill Number Assigned |