WY HB0003 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - COW:Failed 2-27-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to outfitters and guides; providing that a violation of rules and regulations of the board of outfitters and professional guides shall be grounds for the imposition of a civil penalty; providing all proceedings which may result in the imposition of a civil penalty shall adhere to the requirements of the Wyoming Administrative Procedure Act; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board of outfitters and guides-civil penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - COW:Failed 2-27-1-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-7-9-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11SenateCOW:Failed 2-27-1-0-0
2019-02-07SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-07SenateS06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced and Referred to S06 - Travel
2019-01-16SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-16House3rd Reading:Passed 44-7-9-0-0
2019-01-15House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-14HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-14HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-14HouseH06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H06 - Travel
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-12-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback