WY HB0003 | 2024 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Hearing: Feb 29 in Capitol Extension Room W006 & Online
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to taxation; establishing a tax exemption for long-term homeowners; providing a penalty for false claims; providing a sunset date; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property tax exemption for long-term homeowners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-3-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Pursuant to HR 7-7 Accelerated to 3rd Reading 45-17-0-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 59-2-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-28SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
2024-02-23SenateReceived for Introduction
2024-02-22House3rd Reading:Passed 59-3-0-0-0
2024-02-22House3rd Reading:Pursuant to HR 7-7 Accelerated to 3rd Reading 45-17-0-0-0
2024-02-22House2nd Reading:Passed
2024-02-21House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2024-02-20HouseCOW:Passed
2024-02-20HousePlaced on General File
2024-02-20HouseH03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2024-02-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 59-2-1-0-0
2024-01-24HouseReceived for Introduction
2023-11-30 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2024/HB0003
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2024/Introduced/HB0003.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2024/Engross/HB0003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2024/Amends/HB0003HS001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2024/Amends/HB0003H2001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2024/Amends/HB0003H2002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2024/Amends/HB0003H2003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2024/Amends/HB0003H2004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2024/Amends/HB0003H3001.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2024/Fiscal/HB0003.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2024/HB0003#5012
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2024/HB0003#-92
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2024/HB0003#5299
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2024/HB0003#5304

Bill Comments

feedback