WY HB0001 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - See Mirror Bill SF0001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to supplemental appropriations for the operation of state government; increasing or decreasing certain amounts; adjusting the number of authorized positions; modifying prior appropriations; making additional appropriations; making certain appropriations subject to the terms and conditions specified; providing transfers of certain funds as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General government appropriations-2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 15 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - House - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 23 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - House - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 15 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - House - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 23 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - House - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - COW:Passed (Y: 17 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - House - COW:Passed (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - COW:Passed (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - COW:Passed (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - COW:Passed (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - COW:Passed (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - COW:Passed (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - COW:Passed (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - COW:Passed (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - COW:Passed (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - COW:Passed (Y: 17 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - House - COW:Passed (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - COW:Passed (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - COW:Passed (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - COW:Passed (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - COW:Passed (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - COW:Passed (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - COW:Passed (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - COW:Passed (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - COW:Passed (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-04 See Mirror Bill SF0001
2015-03-04HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-03-04SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-23SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-23 Senate:Pursuant to JR 14-1 (f) referred directly to 3rd Reading
2015-02-20SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02
2015-02-20SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-02-19House3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0
2015-02-17House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-12HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-11HouseCOW:Considered
2015-02-05HouseIntroduced and Referred to HCOW
2015-02-03HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-02-03 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback