WV SCR5 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Home of Coach Bob Bolen Mountain State University 2004 NAIA Champions sign

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home of Coach Bob Bolen Mountain State University 2004 NAIA Champions sign

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-09HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-09HouseAdopted by House (Voice vote)
2019-03-09HouseImmediate consideration
2019-03-09HouseReference dispensed
2019-03-09HouseReported by the Clerk
2019-03-09HouseBe adopted
2019-03-05HouseTo House Rules
2019-03-05HouseBe adopted, but first to Rules
2019-02-15HouseTo House Technology and Infrastructure
2019-02-15HouseTo Technology and Infrastructure then Rules
2019-02-15HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-14SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-14SenateAdopted by Senate (Voice vote)
2019-02-14SenateOn Unfinished Business
2019-02-13SenateReported be adopted
2019-01-10SenateTo Government Organization
2019-01-10SenateTo Government Organization
2019-01-10SenateOn Unfinished Business
2019-01-09SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-09SenateFiled for introduction

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback