WV SB330 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 115, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring contact information be listed on agency's online directory and website

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring contact information be listed on agency's online directory and website

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 369) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 454) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 196) (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 115, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/19/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/19/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-19SenateTo Governor 3/19/19
2019-03-07HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-06SenateCompleted legislative action
2019-03-06SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-06SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 369)
2019-03-06SenateSenate concurred in House title amendment (Voice vote)
2019-03-06SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-05HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-05HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-05HousePassed House (Roll No. 454)
2019-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-05HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-04HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-04HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-02HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-02HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-01HouseDo pass
2019-02-25HouseTo House Government Organization
2019-02-25HouseTo Government Organization
2019-02-25HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-23SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-23SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 196)
2019-02-23SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-23SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-22SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-22SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-21SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-21SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-20SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-01-16SenateTo Government Organization
2019-01-16SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-16SenateTo Government Organization
2019-01-16SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5F15Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback