WV HB5540 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 118, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 118, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to mandate Fentanyl Prevention and Awareness Education, which shall be known as "Laken's Law".
Title
Relating to fentanyl prevention and awareness Education (Laken’s Law)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 420) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 249) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 238) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 249) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 238) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Chapter 118, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/21/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-01 | House | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-01 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 420) |
2024-03-01 | House | Immediate consideration |
2024-03-01 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 249) |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 238) |
2024-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-20 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-19 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-19 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-02-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-19 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-15 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-02-09 | House | To House Education |
2024-02-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-09 | House | To Education |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB750 (Similar To) 2024-02-21 - Referred to Rules