WV HB5065 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Referred to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Referred to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill generally relates to continuing education requirements and compensation of Guardians Ad Litem.
Title
Regarding continuing education requirements and compensation of Guardians Ad Litem
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 253) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance |
2024-02-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-22 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-21 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 253) |
2024-02-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-20 | House | Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote) |
2024-02-20 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-02-20 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-20 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-19 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-19 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-15 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2024-02-01 | House | To House Finance |
2024-02-01 | House | By substitute, do pass, but first to Finance |
2024-01-24 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-24 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2024-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB5581 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 21 | 13a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
44 | 10 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 4 | 601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |