WI SJR9 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Read and referred to committee on Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Read and referred to committee on Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: proclaiming January 2023 as human trafficking awareness and prevention month.
Title
Proclaiming January 2023 as human trafficking awareness and prevention month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2023-03-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Adopted |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Representative Cabrera added as a cosponsor |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/proposals/reg/sen/joint_resolution/sjr9 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2023/REG/SJR9.pdf |