WI SJR9 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-7)
Status: Enrolled on May 19 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 19 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: proclaiming May 15, 16, and 17, 2015, Syttende Mai Weekend.
Title
Proclaiming May 15, 16, and 17, 2015, Syttende Mai Weekend.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-19 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2015-05-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-05-13 | House | Representative Kahl added as a cosponsor |
2015-05-13 | House | Concurred in |
2015-05-07 | House | Placed on calendar 5-13-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-05-05 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2015-04-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-21-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Introduced |