WI SJR8 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 11 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-18 - Not published
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 11 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-18 - Not published
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: modifying the session schedule for the 2009-10 biennial session period and extending the deadline for the governor's budget message.
Title
Modifying the session schedule for the 2009-10 biennial session period and extending the deadline for the governor's budget message.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-18 | Not published | |
2009-02-13 | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 2-13-2009. Enrolled Joint Resolution 2. | |
2009-02-11 | Report correctly enrolled on 2-11-2009 | |
2009-02-10 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2009-02-10 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-02-10 | Concurred in | |
2009-02-10 | Read | |
2009-02-10 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-10 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-02-10 | Adopted | |
2009-02-10 | Senate amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author | |
2009-02-10 | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Carpenter | |
2009-02-05 | Made a special order of business at 10:01 A.M. on Tuesday, February 10, 2009 by committee on Senate Organization, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2009-02-05 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-02-05 | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization | |
2009-02-05 | Introduced |