WI SJR79 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-27 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-27 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: the life and public service of Rodney Warren Kreunen.
Title
The life and public service of Rodney Warren Kreunen.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | Senate | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 13 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 5-26-2016 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-18 | House | Concurred in |
2016-02-16 | House | Placed on calendar 2-18-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-02-11 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-10 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Introduced |