WI SJR72 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-22)
Status: Passed on November 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-16 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-22)
Status: Passed on November 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-16 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: proclaiming the month of October as Breast Cancer Awareness Month.
Title
Proclaiming the month of October as Breast Cancer Awareness Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-16 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-11-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-11-11 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-11-11 | House | Representative Tusler added as a cosponsor |
2021-11-11 | House | Concurred in |
2021-11-10 | House | Representatives Ohnstad and Penterman added as cosponsors |
2021-10-28 | House | Representative Rozar added as a cosponsor |
2021-11-09 | House | Placed on calendar 11-11-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-11-09 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-10-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Adopted |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Representative McGuire added as a cosponsor |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-25-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Senator Petrowski added as a coauthor |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Senator Jagler added as a coauthor |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Representative J. Rodriguez added as a cosponsor |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Introduced |