WI SJR72 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: modifying the session schedule for the 2011-12 biennial session period for the purpose of extending the date for the submission of enrolled bills to the governor for executive action.
Title
Modifying the session schedule for the 2011-12 biennial session period for the purpose of extending the date for the submission of enrolled bills to the governor for executive action.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Senate | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 22 |
2012-04-09 | Senate | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 4-9-2012 |
2012-03-16 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 3-16-2012 |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2012-03-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-13 | House | Concurred in |
2012-03-13 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2012-03-13 | House | Read |
2012-03-13 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Adopted |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Placed at the foot of the 12th order of business on the calendar of 03-13-2012 |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-13-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Introduced |